US HB6650 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on August 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Earthquake Hazards Reduction Program Reauthorization Act of 2018
Title
National Earthquake Hazards Reduction Program Reauthorization Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2018-08-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2018-08-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-08-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-08-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-08-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1768 (Related) 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-307.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6650/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6650/BILLS-115hr6650ih.pdf |