US HB6633 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-20 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-20 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the U.S. courthouse located at 101 East Pecan Street in Sherman, Texas, as the "Paul Brown United States Courthouse."
Title
To designate the United States courthouse located at 101 East Pecan Street in Sherman, Texas, as the "Paul Brown United States Courthouse".
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] |
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2012-12-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-19 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7318) |
2012-12-19 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7318) |
2012-12-19 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2012-12-19 | House | Mr. Denham asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. (consideration: CR H7318) |
2012-12-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2012-12-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
Texas
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
Texas