US HB6621 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 530 East Main Street in Johnson City, Tennessee, as the "Major Homer L. Pease Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 530 East Main Street in Johnson City, Tennessee, as the "Major Homer L. Pease Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 530 East Main Street in Johnson City, Tennessee, as the "Major Homer L. Pease Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7528) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9728) |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9728) |
2018-11-29 | House | Mr. Comer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-11-29 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Tennessee
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Postal service
Tennessee