US HB6611 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - Reported by the Committee on Intelligence. H. Rept. 118-302, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - Reported by the Committee on Intelligence. H. Rept. 118-302, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 to make certain reforms to the authorities under such Act, to reauthorize title VII of such Act, and for other purposes.
Title
FISA Reform and Reauthorization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Intelligence. H. Rept. 118-302, Part I. |
2023-12-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2023-12-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-12-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7320 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6611/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6611/BILLS-118hr6611ih.pdf |