US HB6604 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-29 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the federal building currently known as Federal Office Building 8, located at 200 C Street SW in the District of Columbia, as the "Thomas P. O'Neill, Jr. Federal Building."
Title
To designate the federal building currently known as Federal Office Building 8, located at 200 C Street Southwest in the District of Columbia, as the "Thomas P. O'Neill, Jr. Federal Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Pelosi [D-CA] | Rep. John Boehner [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2012-11-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-11-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6474) |
2012-11-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6604. |
2012-11-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6474-6477) |
2012-11-28 | House | Mr. Denham moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-11-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3687 (Related) 2012-12-28 - Became Public Law No: 112-237.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
District of Columbia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
District of Columbia
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
House of Representatives
Members of Congress