US HB660 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-22 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-22 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Commerce to establish a grant program to benefit coastal habitats, resiliency, and the economy, and for other purposes.
Title
Shovel-Ready Restoration Grants for Coastlines and Fisheries Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Mary Peltola [D-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/660/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr660/BILLS-117hr660ih.pdf |