US HB660 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 573.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 573.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bureau of Reclamation Transparency Act (Sec. 4) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to submit to Congress, make publicly available, and biennially update an Asset Management Report that describes the Bureau of Reclamation's efforts to maintain in a reliable manner all reserved works (buildings, structures, facilities, or equipment owned by Reclamation for which operations and maintenance are performed by its employees or through a contract with Reclamation) at Reclamation facilities, and to standardize and streamline data reporting and processes across regions and areas for the purpose of maintaining such works. Such report shall include: (1) a detailed assessment of major repair and rehabilitation needs for all such works; and (2) an itemized list of major repair and rehabilitation needs of individual Reclamation facilities at each Reclamation project, including a budget level cost estimate of appropriations needed to complete each item and an assignment of a categorical rating for each item consistent with existing uniform categorization systems to inform the annual budget process and agency requirements. (Sec. 5) Interior shall: (1) coordinate with the nonfederal entities responsible for the operation and maintenance of transferred works (Reclamation facilities at which operations and maintenance are carried out by a nonfederal entity under a formal agreement with Reclamation) in developing reporting requirements for Asset Management Reports with respect to major repair and rehabilitation needs for such works, and (2) develop and implement a categorical rating system for transferred works. (Sec. 6) The bill reduces the maximum amount of the federal share of the cost of the Central Valley Water Recycling Project otherwise available as of the date of enactment of this bill by $2 million.
Title
Bureau of Reclamation Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] |
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 573. |
2018-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8142-8143) |
2018-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 660. |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8142-8144) |
2018-09-12 | House | Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-06-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 103. |
2017-06-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-156. |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-04-27 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB216 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 127.
SB2563 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB2563 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Department of the Interior
Government information and archives
Infrastructure development
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Department of the Interior
Government information and archives
Infrastructure development
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water use and supply