US HB6586 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-273.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-273.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Space Exploration Sustainability Act - Amends the National Aeronautics and Space Administration Authorization Act of 2010 to express the sense of Congress that the Administrator of the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) shall proceed with the use of the International Space Station (ISS), technology development, and follow-on transportation systems (including the space launch system and the multipurpose crew vehicle) in a manner ensuring: (1) that these capabilities remain inherently complementary and interrelated; (2) a balance of the development, sustainment, and use of each of these capabilities, which are of critical importance to the viability and sustainability of the U.S. space program; and (3) that resources required to support the timely and sustainable development of these capabilities authorized in either title III or title IV of such Act are not derived from a reduction in resources for the capabilities authorized in the other title. Extends, through December 31, 2013, the authority of the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) to pay compensation for claims in excess of a commercial space launcher's required insurance coverage. Amends the Iran, North Korea, and Syria Nonproliferation Act to remove the purchase of goods or services relating to human space flight not required to be made under a contract or other agreement in effect on January 1, 1999, from the definition of "extraordinary payments in connection with the International Space Station" which federal agencies are prohibited from making to the Russian Aviation and Space Agency (RASA) and organizations or entities under its jurisdiction unless the President makes specified determinations regarding Russian cooperation in preventing weapons proliferation relating to Iran, North Korea, and Syria. (Thus waives the presidential determination requirement for federal agency payments to RASA for the purchase of any goods or services relating to human space flight.) Extends from July 1, 2016, to December 31, 2020, the current exception to the presidential determination requirement for payments for work to be performed or services to be rendered for work on the ISS before such date necessary to meet U.S. obligations under the Agreement Concerning Cooperation on the Civil International Space Station.
Title
Space Exploration Sustainability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] | Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-14 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-273. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-01-02 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7584-7585) |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Mr. Smith (TX) asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7584-7585) |
2013-01-01 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-01-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-01-01 | Senate | S.AMDT.3449 Amendment SA 3449 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-01-01 | Senate | S.AMDT.3449 Amendment SA 3449 proposed by Senator Pryor for Senator Nelson FL. (consideration: CR 12/31/2012 S8609; text: CR 12/31/2012 S8609)In the nature of a substitute. |
2013-01-01 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR 12/31/2012 S8608-8609) |
2012-11-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2012-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6335) |
2012-11-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6341) |
2012-11-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Palazzo objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. |
2012-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6586. |
2012-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6335-6337) |
2012-11-13 | House | Mr. Palazzo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-11-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Life, casualty, property insurance
Science, technology, communications
Space flight and exploration
Spacecraft and satellites
Life, casualty, property insurance
Science, technology, communications
Space flight and exploration
Spacecraft and satellites