US HB6572 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Commerce to take actions necessary and appropriate to promote the competitiveness of the United States related to the deployment, use, application, and competitiveness of blockchain technology or other distributed ledger technology, and for other purposes.
Title
Deploying American Blockchains Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 210 (Y: 334 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2024-05-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-05-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 334 - 79 (Roll no. 210). (text: 5/14/2024 CR H3040-3041) |
2024-05-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3256-3257) |
2024-05-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-05-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6572. |
2024-05-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3040-3042) |
2024-05-14 | House | Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2024-05-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 417. |
2024-05-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-501. |
2023-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 46 - 0. |
2023-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-12-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-12-04 | House | Introduced in House |