US HB6566 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agent Orange Exposure Fairness Act This bill, with respect to veterans exposed to certain herbicide agents during military, naval, or air service in Vietnam between January 9, 1962, and May 7, 1975: (1) removes the manifestation period required for presumption of service connection for chloracne and porphyria cutanea tarda, and (2) includes in such presumption acute and subacute peripheral neuropathy becoming manifest to a disability degree of 10% or more. Under a presumption of service-connection, specific disabilities diagnosed in certain veterans are presumed to have been caused by the circumstances of their military service. Health care benefits and disability compensation may then be awarded without having to go through a separate adjudicative process.
Title
Agent Orange Exposure Fairness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2018-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3355 (Related) 2018-08-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6566/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6566/BILLS-115hr6566ih.pdf |