US HB654 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pacific Northwest Earthquake Preparedness Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to: (1) develop a plan for the purchase and installation of an earthquake early warning system for the Cascadia Subduction Zone, and (2) identify the funds necessary for its implementation. Such zone is the landward-dipping fault that is approximately 684 miles long, separates the Juan de Fuca and North America plates, and stretches along the western coast of the United States from Cape Mendocino, California, to Northern Vancouver Island, British Columbia. (Sec. 3) The President shall establish an Earthquake and Tsunami Task Force for the purpose of developing a comprehensive strategy and recommendations on how the nation should prepare and plan for, mitigate against, respond to, recover from, and more successfully adapt to an earthquake, tsunami, or combined earthquake and tsunami event in such zone. Such recommendations shall include recommendations on: (1) administrative or legislative changes and funding required to implement the strategy, and (2) the order of priority for implementation of the strategy. The Task Force shall enter into an agreement with the National Academies for developing recommendations for a federal research strategy to advance scientific understanding of a zone earthquake and resulting tsunami preparedness. (Sec. 4) FEMA shall be responsible for the nation's efforts to reduce the loss of life and property, and to protect the nation, from an earthquake, tsunami, or combined earthquake and tsunami event by developing the ability to prepare and plan for, mitigate against, respond to, recover from, and more successfully adapt to such an event. (Sec. 5) The bill amends the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to authorize recipients to use hazard mitigation assistance to conduct activities to help reduce the risk of future damage, hardship, loss, or suffering in any area affected by earthquake hazards, including making improvements to: regional seismic networks in support of building a capability for earthquake early warning; geodetic networks in support of building a capability for earthquake early warning; and seismometers, Global Positioning System receivers, and associated infrastructure in support of building a capability for earthquake early warning.
Title
Pacific Northwest Earthquake Preparedness Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 196 (Y: 395 N: 11 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-03-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-03-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 11 (Roll no. 196). (text: CR H2450-2451) |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2454-2455) |
2017-03-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-03-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 654. |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2450-2452) |
2017-03-27 | House | Mr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 12. |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-30. |
2017-02-28 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2017-02-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-01-24 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E91) |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
California
Canada
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Intergovernmental relations
Natural disasters
Oregon
Research administration and funding
Washington State
California
Canada
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Intergovernmental relations
Natural disasters
Oregon
Research administration and funding
Washington State