US HB6538 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for a definition of "establishment, determination, or adjustment of employee compensation" for purposes of the collective bargaining of certain Department of Veterans Affairs employees.
Title
VA Correct Compensation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Morgan McGarvey [D-KY] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Derrick Van Orden [R-WI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Lori Chavez-DeRemer [R-OR] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
Rep. Andrea Salinas [D-OR] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Marie Gluesenkamp Perez [D-WA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] | Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] |
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Jennifer McClellan [D-VA] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Nikki Budzinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Marcus Molinaro [R-NY] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Greg Landsman [D-OH] | Rep. Delia Ramirez [D-IL] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Christopher Deluzio [D-PA] |
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote. |
2024-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-12-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-11-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6538/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6538/BILLS-118hr6538ih.pdf |