US HB6513 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1110 West Market Street in Athens, Alabama, as the "Judge James E. Horton, Jr. Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1110 West Market Street in Athens, Alabama, as the "Judge James E. Horton, Jr. Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1110 West Market Street in Athens, Alabama, as the "Judge James E. Horton, Jr. Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] |
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7528) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9728) |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9727-9728) |
2018-11-29 | House | Mr. Comer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-11-29 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Alabama
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
Postal service
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
Postal service