US HB6494 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 49, United States Code, to provide enhanced safety in pipeline transportation, and for other purposes.
Title
PIPES Act of 2023 Promoting Innovation in Pipeline Efficiency and Safety Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Troy Nehls [R-TX] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-12-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-12-06 | House | Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Discharged |
2023-12-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2023-11-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-11-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1484 (Related) 2023-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6509 (Related) 2023-12-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
HB6510 (Related) 2023-12-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
HB6509 (Related) 2023-12-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
HB6510 (Related) 2023-12-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6494/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6494/BILLS-118hr6494ih.pdf |