US HB6491 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Using Data to Prevent Opioid Diversion Act of 2018
Title
Using Data to Prevent Opioid Diversion Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2838 (Related) 2018-06-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 476.
HB6779 (Related) 2018-09-12 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6779 (Related) 2018-09-12 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government information and archives
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Retail and wholesale trades
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government information and archives
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6491/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6491/BILLS-115hr6491ih.pdf |