US HB648 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Trauma Systems and Regionalization of Emergency Care Reauthorization Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize trauma care programs through FY2020. (Sec. 3) Grants for pilot projects of innovative models of emergency care and trauma systems can be allocated up to half of the remaining funds for trauma care after allocations for improvement of emergency medical services in rural areas and administrative purposes. State plans for emergency medical services are required to include the national standards and requirements of the American Burn Association for verified burn centers. The Department of Health and Human Services must update the model plan for designation of trauma centers and for triage, transfer, and transportation policies, taking into account standards from the American Burn Association.
Title
Trauma Systems and Regionalization of Emergency Care Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 382 N: 15 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2015-03-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 15 (Roll no. 114). (text: CR H1642-1643) |
2015-03-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-03-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1650) |
2015-03-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-03-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 648. |
2015-03-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1642-1643) |
2015-03-16 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-03-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 28. |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-43. |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB763 (Same As) 2015-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1588)
Subjects
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding