US HB6463 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MARKET CHOICE Act Modernizing America with Rebuilding to Kickstart the Economy of the Twenty-first Century with a Historic Infrastructure-Centered Expansion Act
Title
MARKET CHOICE Act Modernizing America with Rebuilding to Kickstart the Economy of the Twenty-first Century with a Historic Infrastructure-Centered Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2018-08-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2018-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2018-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2018-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, Education and the Workforce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-07-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2607 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6463/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6463/BILLS-115hr6463ih.pdf |