US HB6456 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Public Housing Regulatory Relief Expansion Act of 2018
Title
Small Public Housing Regulatory Relief Expansion Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-07-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3160 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB4074 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HB4074 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6456/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6456/BILLS-115hr6456ih.pdf |