US HB6443 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Advancing Cybersecurity Diagnostics and Mitigation Act This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) deploy, operate, and maintain a continuous diagnostics and mitigation program to collect, analyze, and visualize security data and cybersecurity risk; (2) regularly deploy new technologies and modify existing technologies to improve such program; and (3) develop a comprehensive strategy to carry out the program. In carrying out the program, DHS must ensure that cybersecurity risk information, assessments, and analyses are provided in real time and program information is available to the DHS national cybersecurity and communications integration center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advancing Cybersecurity Diagnostics and Mitigation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2018-09-04HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-04HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7793)
2018-09-04HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6443.
2018-09-04HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR S7793-7796)
2018-09-04HouseMr. Ratcliffe moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-08-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 706.
2018-08-28HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-910.
2018-07-24HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2018-07-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-07-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2018-07-19HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3464 (Related) 2018-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback