US HB644 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 139-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conscience Protection Act of 2017 This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to codify the prohibition against the federal government and state and local governments that receive federal financial assistance for health-related activities penalizing or discriminating against a health care provider based on the provider's refusal to be involved in, or provide coverage for, abortion. Health care providers include health care professionals, health care facilities, social services providers, health care professional training programs, and health insurers. The Office for Civil Rights of the Department of Health and Human Services, in coordination with the Department of Justice (DOJ), must investigate complaints alleging discrimination based on an individual's religious belief, moral conviction, or refusal to be involved in an abortion. DOJ or any entity adversely affected by such discrimination may obtain equitable or legal relief in a civil action. Administrative remedies do not need to be sought or exhausted prior to commencing an action or granting relief. Such an action may be brought against a governmental entity.
Title
Conscience Protection Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB301 (Same As) 2017-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB3354 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 230.
HB6470 (Related) 2018-07-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 667.
HB3354 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 230.
HB6470 (Related) 2018-07-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 667.
Subjects
Abortion
Civil actions and liability
Disability and health-based discrimination
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Religion
Civil actions and liability
Disability and health-based discrimination
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Religion
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/644/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr644/BILLS-115hr644ih.pdf |