US HB6439 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 724.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Biometric Identification Transnational Migration Alert Program Authorization Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to provide statutory authority for the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) Biometric Identification Transnational Migration Alert Program (BITMAP). That program was established to address and reduce national security, border security, and terrorist threats before such threats reach the international border of the United States. In carrying out BITMAP operations, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement must: (1) coordinate foreign and U.S. officials to facilitate the sharing of biometric and biographic information of foreign nationals to identify and screen such nationals for terrorism and threats to national or border security; (2) provide capabilities, including training and equipment, to collect and compare biometric and biographic identification data of foreign nationals to protect against national security, border security, or terrorist threats and illegal entries; and (3) ensure that such data are incorporated into appropriate government databases. Before carrying out BITMAP operations in a foreign country, DHS must enter into an agreement with the government of such country that outlines such operations and must provide the congressional homeland security committees with a copy of the agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Biometric Identification Transnational Migration Alert Program Authorization Act of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-04 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 381 (Y: 272 N: 119 NV: 37 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-05SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 724.
2018-12-05SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-419.
2018-09-26SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2018-09-05SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2018-09-04HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-04HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 272 - 119 (Roll no. 381). (text: CR H7786-7787)
2018-09-04HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR S7806)
2018-09-04HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2018-09-04HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6439.
2018-09-04HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR S7786-7789)
2018-09-04HouseMr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2018-08-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 705.
2018-08-28HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-909.
2018-07-24HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2018-07-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-07-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2018-07-19HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6136 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6415 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback