US HB6428 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Frank Leone Post Office Act Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 332 Ramapo Valley Road in Oakland, New Jersey, as the "Frank Leone Post Office."
Title
Frank Leone Post Office Act
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7528) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-29 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9727) |
2018-11-29 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9727) |
2018-11-29 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-11-29 | House | Mr. Comer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-07-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
New Jersey
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
New Jersey
Postal service