US HB6399 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Defense Production Act of 1950 to ensure the supply of certain medical articles essential to national defense, and for other purposes.
Title
SAVE Act of 2020 Securing America’s Vaccines for Emergencies Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2020-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3715 (Same As) 2020-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immunology and vaccination
Industrial facilities
Manufacturing
Materials
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Strategic materials and reserves
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immunology and vaccination
Industrial facilities
Manufacturing
Materials
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Strategic materials and reserves
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6399/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6399/BILLS-116hr6399ih.pdf |