US HB6392 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Negotiating for Seniors Act - Amends part D (Voluntary Prescription Drug Benefit Program) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to repeal the prohibition against: (1) interference by the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) with the negotiations between drug manufacturers and pharmacies and prescription drug plan sponsors, and (2) the Secretary's requiring a particular formulary or instituting a price structure for the reimbursement of covered Medicare part D drugs.
Title
Negotiating for Seniors Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2012-09-13 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2012-09-13 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2012-09-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2248 (Related) 2011-07-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3638 (Related) 2012-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
SB44 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3638 (Related) 2012-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
SB44 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/6392/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr6392/BILLS-112hr6392ih.pdf |