US HB637 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to provide retraining assistance to certain veterans unemployed by reason of the COVID-19 public health emergency.
Title
Veterans Economic Recovery Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB134 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB1319 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-2.
HB1319 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-2.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/637/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr637/BILLS-117hr637ih.pdf |