US HB6364 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
World War I Centennial Commission Act - Establishes the World War I Centennial Commission to: (1) plan, develop, and execute programs, projects, and activities to commemorate the centennial of World War I; (2) encourage private organizations and state and local governments to organize and participate in such activities; (3) facilitate and coordinate such activities throughout the United States; (4) serve as a clearinghouse for the collection and dissemination of information about centennial events and plans; and (5) develop recommendations for Congress and the President for commemorating the centennial of World War I. Prohibits the obligation of federal funds to carry out this Act.
Title
World War I Centennial Commission Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Russ Carnahan [D-MO] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] |
Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Mike McIntyre [D-NC] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Kevin Yoder [R-KS] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-31 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 401 N: 5 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-31 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 401 N: 5 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-31 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Concur in the Senate Amendment (Y: 401 N: 5 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-14 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-272. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-31 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 401 - 5 (Roll no. 654). (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7496-7497) |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7513-7514) |
2012-12-31 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Norton objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2012-12-31 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 6364. |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Mr. Chaffetz moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7495-7498) |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-21 | Senate | S.AMDT.3433 Amendment SA 3433 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-21 | Senate | S.AMDT.3433 Amendment SA 3433 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator McCaskill. (consideration: CR S8378)In the nature of a substitute. |
2012-12-21 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8378) |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2012-12-12 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6733-6735) |
2012-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6364. |
2012-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6733-6739) |
2012-12-12 | House | Mr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2012-12-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-701, Part I. |
2012-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-12-05 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged. |
2012-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-09-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. |
2012-09-10 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2012-09-10 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2012-09-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB938 (Related) 2012-01-24 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Commemorative events and holidays
District of Columbia
Military history
Missouri
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Social sciences and history
U.S. history
Commemorative events and holidays
District of Columbia
Military history
Missouri
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Social sciences and history
U.S. history