US HB6345 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 818.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 818.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EMPOWERS Act of 2018 Ensuring Meaningful Petition Outreach While Enhancing Rights of States Act of 2018 This bill amends the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to revise the process for listing, delisting, or reclassifying a species under the Act. Before submitting to the Department of the Interior or the Department of Commerce, as appropriate, a petition to list a species as a threatened or endangered species, the petitioner must notify each county and state in which the species is located of the intent to submit a petition. Upon finding that the petition may be warranted, the appropriate department must solicit advice from each county and state in which the species is located. If a state or county advises that the listing is not warranted, then the appropriate department may not proceed with the listing unless the department demonstrates that the information submitted in support of the advice is incorrect and that the listing is warranted. The bill expands requirements regarding providing notice of a proposed regulation that determines whether a species is endangered or threatened, including by requiring the appropriate department to provide notice to each person who requests a notice. The appropriate department must justify a final regulation that conflicts with the advice of a state or county.
Title
EMPOWERS Act of 2018 Ensuring Meaningful Petition Outreach While Enhancing Rights of States Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] |
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] |
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 818. |
2018-11-27 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1051. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 12. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-26 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2018-07-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-07-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental protection
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Administrative remedies
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental protection
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection