US HB6334 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the United States to participate in the Coalition for Epidemic Preparedness Innovations (CEPI), an alliance of countries and private partners whose mission is to finance and coordinate the development of vaccines for high-priority, epidemic-potential threats. The President must submit a report outlining (1) planned U.S. contributions to, and participation in, CEPI; (2) the manner and extent to which the United States shall participate in the governance of CEPI; and (3) how participation in CEPI supports U.S. government strategies and programs in health security and biodefense.
Title
Securing America From Epidemics Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5880-5881) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6334. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5880-5882) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-04-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights, and International Organizations. |
2020-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Chemical and biological weapons
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health promotion and preventive care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Medical research
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
World health
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health promotion and preventive care
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Medical research
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
World health