US HB6332 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Improving Strategies to Counter Weapons Proliferation Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Financial Crimes Enforcement Network (FinCEN) to report on the usage of financial activity data collected by FinCEN related to weapons proliferation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving Strategies to Counter Weapons Proliferation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2018-09-26HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-26HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9063)
2018-09-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6332.
2018-09-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9063)
2018-09-26HouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2018-08-24HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 701.
2018-08-24HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-905.
2018-07-24HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 56 - 0.
2018-07-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-07-11HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2018-07-11HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback