US HB6328 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Advancing Procurement Technical Assistance Centers Act
Title
Advancing Procurement Technical Assistance Centers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2018-07-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6389 (Related) 2018-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6389 (Related) 2018-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6328/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6328/BILLS-115hr6328ih.pdf |