US HB632 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 188-50-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mark Takai Atomic Veterans Healthcare Parity Act This bill includes veterans who participated in the cleanup of Enewetak Atoll in the Marshall Islands between January 1, 1977, and December 31, 1980, as radiation exposed veterans for purposes of the Department of Veterans Affairs presumption of service-connection for specified cancers.
Title
Mark Takai Atomic Veterans Healthcare Parity Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2017-02-03 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB283 (Same As) 2017-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2821 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2821 (Related) 2018-05-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cancer
Marshall Islands
Nuclear weapons
Radiation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Cancer
Marshall Islands
Nuclear weapons
Radiation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/632/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr632/BILLS-115hr632ih.pdf |