US HB6313 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 661.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 661.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Responsible Additions and Increases to Sustain Employee Health Benefits Act of 2018 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow unused health flexible spending arrangement (FSA) account balances (or a portion of the balances) to be carried forward into the next plan year. For a year in which a balance is carried forward from the preceding year, the dollar limitation on salary reduction contributions to an FSA must be reduced by the amount by which the carried forward balance exceeds $500.
Title
Responsible Additions and Increases to Sustain Employee Health Benefits Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 661. |
2018-07-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-853. |
2018-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14. |
2018-07-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-07-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-07-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1204 (Related) 2017-02-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2802 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6311 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Received in the Senate.
SB2802 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6311 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Received in the Senate.