US HB6299 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Nevada Lands Bill Technical Corrections Act of 2018
Title
Nevada Lands Bill Technical Corrections Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8854-8856) |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6299. |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8854-8856) |
2018-09-25 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 759. |
2018-09-25 | House | Committee on Oversight and Government discharged. |
2018-09-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-971, Part I. |
2018-09-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-05 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-06-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2374 (Related) 2017-09-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 221.
SB1046 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB3349 (Related) 2018-08-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1046 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB3349 (Related) 2018-08-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.