US HB629 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 9.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 9.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent S Corporation Built-in Gain Recognition Period Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Amends the Internal Revenue Code to reduce from 10 years to 5 years the period during which the built-in gains of an S corporation are subject to tax and to make such reduction permanent.
Title
Permanent S Corporation Built-in Gain Recognition Period Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 9. |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-15. |
2015-02-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 14. |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2788 (Related) 2015-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1905 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2029 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-113. (TXT | PDF)
SB1905 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2029 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-113. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Business investment and capital
Capital gains tax
Securities
Small business
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Business investment and capital
Capital gains tax
Securities
Small business
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation