US HB6267 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
Pending: House Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend title 5, United States Code, to establish Election Day as a Federal holiday.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Day Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
2023-11-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB7329 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
HB11 (Related) 2023-07-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Protection.
SB1 (Related) 2023-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB2344 (Related) 2023-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback