US HB6265 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

PreCheck is PreCheck Act of 2018 This bill directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to ensure that only travelers who are members of a trusted traveler program are permitted to use TSA PreCheck security screening lanes at TSA checkpoints. Any traveler under the age of 12 or over the age of 75 who is not a member of a trusted traveler program shall be permitted to utilize PreCheck security screening lanes at TSA checkpoints when traveling on the same reservation as a member of a trusted traveler program. The TSA shall implement a risk modified screening protocol for lanes other than designated TSA PreCheck security screening lanes at TSA checkpoints to further segment passengers based on risk. Only low-risk passengers shall be eligible to undergo risk modified screening at TSA checkpoints. The Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security must assess whether there has been a systematic pattern of violations of the use of TSA PreCheck security screening lanes at TSA checkpoints during the previous calendar year. The TSA shall complete the implementation of a long-term strategy to increase enrollment in the TSA PreCheck Program and expand the total population of members of trusted traveler programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PreCheck is PreCheck Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
2018-09-04HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-04HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7807-7809)
2018-09-04HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6265.
2018-09-04HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR S7807-7809)
2018-09-04HouseMr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-09-04HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 708.
2018-09-04HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-912.
2018-07-24HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2018-07-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-07-24HouseSubcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security Discharged.
2018-07-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security.
2018-06-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
2018-06-28HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback