US HB625 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
REPORT Act Reporting Efficiently to Proper Officials in Response to Terrorism Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), the Department of Justice (DOJ), the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), and, as appropriate, the National Counterterrorism Center (NCC), to submit to Congress an unclassified report on an act of terrorism in the United States within one year after the primary government agency completes an investigation of such act. Such requirement shall not apply in instances in which DHS, DOJ, the FBI, or the NCC determines that the information required to be reported could jeopardize an ongoing investigation or prosecution, in which case DHS shall notify Congress prior to the first anniversary of the completion of the investigation. Such a report shall: (1) identify any gaps in national security that could be addressed to prevent future acts of terrorism, and (2) include any recommendations for additional measures that could be taken to improve homeland security.
Title
REPORT Act Reporting Efficiently to Proper Officials in Response to Terrorism Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] |
Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-06-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4976-4977) |
2017-06-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 625. |
2017-06-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4976-4978) |
2017-06-20 | House | Mr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-06-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 123. |
2017-06-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-182. |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence. |
2017-01-31 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H759) |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1884 (Related) 2018-02-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 336.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Law enforcement administration and funding
Terrorism
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Law enforcement administration and funding
Terrorism