US HB6229 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
National Institute of Standards and Technology Reauthorization Act of 2018
Title
National Institute of Standards and Technology Reauthorization Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8865-8866) |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6229. |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8865-8868) |
2018-09-25 | House | Mrs. Comstock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 764. |
2018-09-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-977. |
2018-06-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-06-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2018-06-26 | House | Introduced in House |