US HB622 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State and Local Sales Tax Deduction Fairness Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the taxpayer election to deduct state and local general sales taxes in lieu of state and local income taxes. (Sec. 3) Prohibits the budgetary effects of this Act from being entered on either PAYGO scorecard maintained under the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010.
Title
State and Local Sales Tax Deduction Fairness Act of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - On Passage (Y: 272 N: 152 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 179 N: 243 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 179 N: 243 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2015-04-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-16 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 272 - 152 (Roll no. 159). (text: CR H2286) |
2015-04-16 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 179 - 243 (Roll no. 158). (consideration: CR H2289-2290) |
2015-04-16 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H2289) |
2015-04-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, pending a reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to strike section 2 of the bill and replace it with a new section prohibiting an increase in the deficit or a delay or weakening of efforts to adopt a permanent extension of the election to deduct State and local sales taxes so long as such an extension is accomplished in a fiscally responsible manner. The amendment also adds a section to extend the deduction of state and local general sales tax for one year. Subsequently, the point of order was withdrawn. |
2015-04-16 | House | Mr. Neal moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Ways and Means. (consideration: CR H2288-2290; text: CR H2288) |
2015-04-16 | House | DEBATE - The House continued with debate on H.R. 622. |
2015-04-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 622. |
2015-04-16 | House | This resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 622, H.R. 1105, and H.R. 1195. |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 200. (consideration: CR H2286-2290) |
2015-04-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 32. |
2015-04-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-51. |
2015-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14. |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR200 (Related) 2015-04-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.