US HB6216 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Make It In America, Create Transportation Manufacturing Jobs in America Act - Eliminates certain grounds for waiving Buy American requirements that the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) obligate federal funding for certain air navigation, highway, and rail activities and projects only if U.S. steel, iron, and manufactured goods are used in such projects. (Retains the current waiver of such Buy American requirements for any case where use of U.S. material will increase overall costs of a highway and roadway or highspeed rail project by more than 25%.) Revises waiver of Buy American requirements. Authorizes the Secretary to waive such requirements if the cost of U.S.-produced components and subcomponents is: (1) more than 60% of the cost of all components of Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) rolling stock in the case of obligations made on or before December 31, 2011; (2) more than 66% of the cost of all components of rolling stock in the case of obligations made during calendar 2014; (3) 75% of the cost of all components of rolling stock in the case of obligations made during calendar 2015; or (4) 85% of the cost of all components of rolling stock in the case of obligations after December 31, 2016. Repeals the Secretary's authority to exempt Amtrak from Buy American requirements in certain circumstances. Revises waiver requirements to authorize a waiver with respect to rolling stock in each of the circumstances enumerated for FAA rolling stock.
Title
Make It In America, Create Transportation Manufacturing Jobs in America Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Betty Sutton [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2012-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2012-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2012-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HB613 (Related) 2011-02-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB6216 (Related) 2012-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB6216 (Related) 2012-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Buy American requirements
National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak)
Public transit
Railroads
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Buy American requirements
National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Amtrak)
Public transit
Railroads
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/6216/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr6216/BILLS-112hr6216ih.pdf |