US HB6202 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To allow States to elect to observe year-round daylight saving time, and for other purposes.
Title
To allow States to elect to observe year-round daylight saving time, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5279 (Related) 2018-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
SB2537 (Related) 2018-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB6331 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB2537 (Related) 2018-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB6331 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6202/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6202/BILLS-115hr6202ih.pdf |