US HB6173 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 235 of the William Wilberforce Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2008 to clarify the standards for family detention, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend section 235 of the William Wilberforce Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2008 to clarify the standards for family detention, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2018-06-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2018-06-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6470 (Related) 2018-07-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 667.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6173/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6173/BILLS-115hr6173ih.pdf |