US HB6167 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural Disaster Assistance Act of 2012 - Extends through FY2012: (1) the supplemental agricultural disaster assistance program; (2) the supplemental revenue assistance payments (SURE) program; (3) the livestock indemnity program; (4) the livestock forage disaster program; (5) the emergency assistance for livestock, honey bees, and farm-raised fish; (6) the tree assistance program; and (7) the Agricultural Disaster Relief Trust Fund.
Title
Agricultural Disaster Assistance Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Leonard Boswell [D-IA] | Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] |
Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2012-07-23 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2012-07-23 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2012-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6192 (Related) 2012-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
SB3384 (Related) 2012-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB3384 (Related) 2012-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Agricultural insurance
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agricultural trade
Agriculture and food
Atmospheric science and weather
Disaster relief and insurance
Government trust funds
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Agricultural trade
Agriculture and food
Atmospheric science and weather
Disaster relief and insurance
Government trust funds
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/6167/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr6167/BILLS-112hr6167ih.pdf |