US HB6100 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Middle Class Tax Cut Protection Act of 2012 - Extends through 2014: (1) the general terminating date of the Economic Growth and Tax Relief Reconciliation Act of 2001, and (2) the reduction in the tax rate for dividend and capital gain income enacted by the Jobs and Growth Tax Relief Reconciliation Act of 2003. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through 2014: (1) the increased American Opportunity tax credit, (2) the increase in the refundable portion of the child tax credit, and (3) the increased earned income tax credit percentage for three or more qualifying children. Disqualifies taxpayers whose income exceeds $250,000 for such extended tax benefits.
Title
Middle Class Tax Cut Protection Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6104 (Related) 2012-07-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3393 (Related) 2012-07-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 457.
HB2710 (Related) 2011-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3412 (Related) 2012-07-25 - Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 48. Record Vote Number: 184. (text: CR S5355-5356)
HB6262 (Related) 2012-08-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3393 (Related) 2012-07-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 457.
HB2710 (Related) 2011-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3412 (Related) 2012-07-25 - Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 48. Record Vote Number: 184. (text: CR S5355-5356)
HB6262 (Related) 2012-08-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Capital gains tax
Family relationships
Higher education
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Marriage and family status
Poverty and welfare assistance
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Transfer and inheritance taxes
U.S. territories and protectorates
Family relationships
Higher education
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Marriage and family status
Poverty and welfare assistance
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Transfer and inheritance taxes
U.S. territories and protectorates
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/6100/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr6100/BILLS-112hr6100ih.pdf |