US HB6088 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a state by law to apply certain requirements of the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970 for an extended unemployment compensation benefit period, with specified substitutions, to the period between August 1, 2010 and September 30, 2011. Eliminates, between such dates, the ordinary 13-week waiting period between extended unemployment compensation benefit periods. Allows a state law, between such dates, also to: (1) reduce from 6.5% to 6% the unemployment rate triggering an "on" indicator for any week; and (2) treat as repealed for the extended unemployment compensation period the requirement regarding the average rate of total unemployment in the state (seasonally adjusted).
Title
To provide for temporary alternative State "on" and "off" indicators under the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-10 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3706 (Related) 2010-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3981 (Related) 2010-12-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8343)
HB6556 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
SB3990 (Related) 2010-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3981 (Related) 2010-12-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S8343)
HB6556 (Related) 2010-12-17 - Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
SB3990 (Related) 2010-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/6088/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr6088/BILLS-111hr6088ih.pdf |