US HB6069 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
FIND Trafficking Act Fight Illicit Networks and Detect Trafficking Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to report on the use of virtual currencies and online marketplaces in sex and drug trafficking. The GAO must study topics including: how illicit proceeds are transferred into the U.S. banking system, state and non-state actors that benefit from or participate in such activity, preventative efforts from federal and state agencies, and how to use the unique characteristics of virtual currencies to track illicit activity.
Title
FIND Trafficking Act Fight Illicit Networks and Detect Trafficking Act
Sponsors
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2018-06-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5589) |
2018-06-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6069. |
2018-06-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5589-5590) |
2018-06-25 | House | Mr. Hill moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-06-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 607. |
2018-06-25 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2018-06-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-781, Part I. |
2018-06-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 53 - 0. |
2018-06-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3179 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB488 (Related) 2018-07-18 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
SB488 (Related) 2018-07-18 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Currency
Digital media
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Internet and video services
Sex offenses
Crime prevention
Crimes against children
Currency
Digital media
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Human trafficking
Internet and video services
Sex offenses