US HB6056 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Advancing Medical Resident Training in Community Hospitals Act of 2018
Title
Advancing Medical Resident Training in Community Hospitals Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] |
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-06-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB284 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4552 (Related) 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1291 (Related) 2017-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3305 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4552 (Related) 2017-12-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1291 (Related) 2017-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3305 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6056/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6056/BILLS-115hr6056ih.pdf |