US HB6040 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5-1)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Continued Free Association with Palau Act of 2012 - Approves, with specified exceptions, the agreement and appendices signed by the United States and the Republic of Palau on September 3, 2010, in connection with the Compact of Free Association between the United States and Palau. Extends funding for: (1) infrastructure maintenance and projects, (2) the Fiscal Consolidation Fund (at a reduced level for FY2012), and (3) specified federal entities. Assents to specified amendments to the Compact subsidiary agreements. Authorizes appropriations to the Department of the Interior for postal services related to Palau, the Federated States of Micronesia, and the Marshall Islands. States that Congress finds that Palau is eligible for certain U.S. domestic programs. Prohibits specified funds from being used for: (1) assistance to China or Argentina, (2) the development innovation ventures program, and (3) contributions to the United Nations Educational, Scientific and Cultural Organization (UNESCO).
Title
Continued Free Association with Palau Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. David Rivera [R-FL] | Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] |
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-07-18 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2012-07-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-07-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2012-07-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2012-06-27 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2012-06-27 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2012-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Appropriations
Argentina
Asia
China
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Health programs administration and funding
Infrastructure development
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Marshall Islands
Micronesia
Oceania
Palau
Postal service
U.S. Institute of Peace
U.S. territories and protectorates
United Nations
World health
Argentina
Asia
China
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Health programs administration and funding
Infrastructure development
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Marshall Islands
Micronesia
Oceania
Palau
Postal service
U.S. Institute of Peace
U.S. territories and protectorates
United Nations
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/6040/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr6040/BILLS-112hr6040ih.pdf |