US HB604 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 176-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 467.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 467.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the long-term improvement of public school facilities, and for other purposes.
Title
Rebuild America’s Schools Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 467. |
2022-12-16 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2022-12-07 | House | House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 15, 2022. |
2022-12-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 117-607, Part I. |
2022-05-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 19. |
2022-05-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB96 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S200-201)