US HB6035 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 790.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 790.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Streamlining Communications for Investors Act
Title
Streamlining Communications for Investors Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 790. |
2018-11-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-1009. |
2018-06-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 23. |
2018-06-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-06-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5999 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.